+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 27, 2002 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On June 26, 2002 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 422 - 4 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On June 25, 2002 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3764 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Oxley moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On April 24, 2002 in the House:
- Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Financial Services, H. Rept. 107-415 , Part II.
- PERMISSION TO FILE REPORT - Mr. Oxley asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Financial Services be permitted to file a supplemental report on the bill H.R. 3764 . Agreed to without objection.
On April 22, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248.
- Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 107-415 .
On April 11, 2002 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee on Capital Markets, Insurance and Government Sponsored Enterprises Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets, Insurance and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor