+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
On November 6, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3743 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On October 21, 2009 in the House:
- Provisions of Measure Incorporated into H.R. 3854 .
On October 8, 2009 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 7, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Finance and Tax.
- Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor