+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On May 8, 1986 in the House:
- Clean Bill to be Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in Lieu.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 12, 1986 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From GSA.
On March 5, 1986 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From FEMA.
On March 3, 1986 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From DOD.
On February 27, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 20, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Seapower and Strategic and Critical Materials.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD, GSA, FEMA.
On November 13, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor