+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On July 23, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Bucshon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3742 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 19, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-613 .
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 149.
On June 7, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On December 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On December 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor