+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 568.
- Committee on the Budget discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-685, Part I.
On December 5, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 6.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
On October 17, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (183)
Type:
Primary Sponsor