+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 19, 1984 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On September 17, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On August 10, 1984 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Government Operations. Report No: 98-978 .
On July 31, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 26, 1984 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From State.
On July 12, 1984 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On August 4, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB, USDA, State, Interior, GAO.
On August 1, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor