+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On June 26, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 8, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From GSA.
On August 25, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Mining, Forest Management and Bonneville Power Administration.
On August 3, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Transportation, Aviation and Materials.
On July 29, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Science and Technology.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor