+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On July 28, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6909-6915)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3696.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6908-6922)
- Mr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 411.
- Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
- Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-550, Part I.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
On December 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House