+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On August 2, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 11, 1984 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Education, Justice.
On August 5, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
On August 4, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice.
On July 27, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor