+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 19, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-699.
- Signed by President.
On November 10, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 21, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 16, 1988 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On September 15, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On September 13, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On August 11, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 519.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-717 .
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 29, 1988 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture Granted an Extension for Further Consideration Ending not Later Than August 11, 1988.
On July 28, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 12, 1988 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 7, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On June 21, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture Sequentially, for a Period Ending not Later than Jul 29, 88.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-717 .
On May 11, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 5, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 26, 1988 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 26, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On December 2, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor