+ − Summary
+ − Actions (24)
On December 4, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On November 26, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education.
On November 15, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Development, Finance, Trade and Monetary Policy.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Stabilization.
On November 7, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Installations and Facilities.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Procurement and Military Nuclear Systems.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Strategic and Critical Materials.
On November 6, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Space.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
On November 5, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Wheat, Soybeans, and Feed Grains.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Operations and Services.
On October 31, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
- Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
- Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor