+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2256-2257)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3680.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2256-2259)
- Mr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 427.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-553.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On October 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House