+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 112-51.
- Signed by President.
On November 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On November 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 197.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
On October 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-17 , Part I.
- Committee on The Budget discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 8.
- Mr. Lungren, Daniel E. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 368 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 396 - 4 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to House Budget
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor