+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On January 26, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water and Power Resources.
On December 14, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water Resources.
On December 2, 1987 in the House:
- House Incorporated this Measure in H.R.791 as an Amendment.
- See H.R.791 .
On December 1, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture.
On November 30, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor