+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 501.
On July 11, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-592 , Part I.
- Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
- Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
- Committee on Judiciary discharged.
- Committee on Intelligence discharged.
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce for a period ending not later than Sept. 21, 2012 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1 of rule X.
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 13.
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology and Innovation.
On January 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On January 4, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
On December 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, and Intelligence , for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Intelligence
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor