+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On September 9, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7347)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3670.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7347-7349)
- Mr. Barton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 8, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 423.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-572.
On July 30, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 29, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On December 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
On December 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor