+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On June 18, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-537 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 385.
- Mr. Smith moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3668 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 6, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On June 5, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On December 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor