+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On January 22, 1992 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Courts and Administrative Practice.
On November 27, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On November 26, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 25, 1991 in the House:
- Mr. Hughes moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 102-368.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 19, 1991 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 31, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Intellectual Property and Judicial Administration.
On October 30, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor