+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 19, 1984 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 98-235.
On March 7, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On March 6, 1984 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On March 2, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On March 2, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment by Voice Vote.
On February 22, 1984 in the Senate:
- House Concurred, in Senate Amendments , with Amendments.
On February 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On November 17, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs incorporated provisions of related measures S. 2075 in reported measure.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Approved for reporting with an amendment favorably.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Mathias with an amendment. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 623.
On October 5, 1983 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On October 4, 1983 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House as D.C. Business.
On September 28, 1983 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 240.
- Reported to House by House Committee on District of Columbia. Report No: 98-394.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 20, 1983 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 12, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Judiciary and Education.
On July 26, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on District of Columbia.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor