+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 6, 1992 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 102-390.
- Signed by President.
On September 25, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 22, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 19, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 19, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Banking discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 2, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.
On July 1, 1992 in the House:
- Mr. Torres moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On June 18, 1992 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 9, 1992 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 8, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 1, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs and Coinage.
On October 29, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor