+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Smith moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 365 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 394 - 1 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 11, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-478 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 334.
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor