+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On October 27, 1992 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 102-531.
- Signed by President.
On October 16, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 13, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 7, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 7, 1992 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report by Voice Vote.
On October 6, 1992 in the Senate:
- Mr. Waxman moved to suspend the rules and agree to the conference report, H. Rept. 102-1019.
On October 6, 1992 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Motions to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the conference report Agreed to by voice vote.
- Conference papers: message on House action held at the desk in Senate.
On October 5, 1992 in the Senate:
- Conference papers: Senate report and managers' statement held at the desk in Senate.
- Conference report H. Rept. 102-1019 filed.
On September 24, 1992 in the Senate:
- Conferees agreed to file conference report.
On March 18, 1992 in the Senate:
- By unanimous consent, the Speaker reserved the right to make additional appointments.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The Chair appointed conferees: Dingell, Waxman, Rowland, Lent, and Bliley.
- On motion that the House disagree to the Senate amendment, and agree to a conference Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Waxman asked unanimous consent that the House disagree to the Senate amendment, and agree to a conference.
On January 22, 1992 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 27, 1991 in the Senate:
- Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Kennedy; Metzenbaum; Harkin; Hatch; Kassebaum.
- S.AMDT.1456 Amendment SP 1456 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 1456 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1456 Proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Kennedy. In the nature of a substitute.
- Amendment SP 1456 proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Kennedy.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On November 21, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On November 19, 1991 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Waxman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 15, 1991 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 186.
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 102-318.
On November 14, 1991 in the House:
- Mr. Waxman asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Energy and Commerce have until 6:00 p.m. on Nov. 15 to file a report on H.R. 3635 . Agreed to without objection.
On November 7, 1991 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On October 24, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1456
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor