+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 13 (Roll no. 485). (text: 11/14/2022 CR H8469)
On November 17, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 13 (Roll no. 485).
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8576-8577)
On November 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 14, 2022 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3630.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8469-8471)
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 22, 2022 in the House:
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-430, Part I.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 336.
- Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
On July 13, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 12, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Ms. Schakowsky.
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (354)
Type:
Primary Sponsor