+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On June 28, 1988 in the House:
- See H.R.4936 .
On April 27, 1988 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On April 22, 1988 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On February 4, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior, USDA.
On January 26, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On November 17, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior, USDA.
On November 16, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On November 10, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor