+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (63)
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Roll call votes on amendments in House
- House amendment not agreed to: On agreeing to the Raskin amendment (A004) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 209 - 214 (Roll no. 105).
- On agreeing to the Lamb amendment (A003) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 189 (Roll no. 104).
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule.
- Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Lamb. (consideration: CR H4107-4108; text: CR H4107)
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Lamb.
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Lamb amendment (A003) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 189 (Roll no. 104).
- On agreeing to the Gottheimer amendment (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 172 (Roll no. 103).
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Raskin.
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule.
- Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Gottheimer. (consideration: CR H4106-4107; text: CR H4106)
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Gottheimer.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Gottheimer amendment (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 172 (Roll no. 103).
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Gottheimer amendment (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 172 (Roll no. 103).
- On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
- Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Rules.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
- Amendment failed by House: On agreeing to the Raskin amendment (A004) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 209 - 214 (Roll no. 105).
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Lamb amendment (A003) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 189 (Roll no. 104).
- House amendment offered
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1017, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Raskin amendment No. 3.
- Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Raskin. (consideration: CR H4108-4110; text: CR H4108)
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 204 (Roll no. 107).
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 204 (Roll no. 107).
- On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 202 - 220 (Roll no. 106).
- The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
- Mr. Latta moved to recommit to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H4112-4116)
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was on agreeing to amendments, which were debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed. (consideration: CR H4111-4112)
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Raskin amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Bentz demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Lamb amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Bentz demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1017, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lamb amendment No. 2.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Gottheimer amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Bentz demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1017, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gottheimer amendment No. 1.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3617.
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3617 and H.R. 6833. The resolutions provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 3617, under a structured rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 6833, under a closed rule. The rule provides that House Resolution 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking April 1, 2022 each place it appears and inserting April 29, 2022.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1017. (consideration: CR H4078-4110, H4110-4111; text: CR S4078-4087)
- On agreeing to the Raskin amendment (A004) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 209 - 214 (Roll no. 105).
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A004) pursuant to the rule.
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1017 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3617 and H.R. 6833. The resolutions provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 3617, under a structured rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 6833, under a closed rule. The rule provides that House Resolution 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking April 1, 2022 each place it appears and inserting April 29, 2022.
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee on Education and Labor discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-276, Part I.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
- Committee on Agriculture discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 203.
- Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
- Committee on Small Business discharged.
- Committee on Natural Resources discharged.
- Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged.
- Committee on Transportation discharged.
On September 30, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 15.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
On July 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, Oversight and Reform, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E592)
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (5)
H.Amdt.187
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.188
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.189
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.190
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (115)
Type:
Primary Sponsor