+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 28, 1990 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 482.
- Reported adversely by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 726, Part II. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
On September 21, 1990 in the House:
- Reported adversely by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 726, Part I. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
On July 25, 1990 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 26, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On May 23, 1990 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On May 15, 1990 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 8, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 5, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Offshore Energy Resources.
On November 15, 1989 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior, Commerce, Army Corps of Engineers, USDA, and DOE.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
On November 8, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor