+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition and Horticulture .
On December 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
On December 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On December 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, Agriculture, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor