+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 410.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-510.
On July 24, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 13.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 7 - 5 .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor