+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights.
On December 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On December 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
On December 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On December 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor