+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 12, 1991 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 102-230.
On December 3, 1991 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On November 26, 1991 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 26, 1991 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Gonzalez asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
On November 25, 1991 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 23, 1991 in the Senate:
- Amendment SP 1435 proposed by Senator Mitchell for Senator Breaux to Amendment SP 1434.
- Senate Committee on Banking discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Amendment SP 1434 proposed by Senator Mitchell for Senator Riegle.
- S.AMDT.1434 Proposed by Senator Mitchell for Senator Riegle. To amend the Cranston-Gonzalez National Affordable Housing Act to reserve assistance under the HOME Investment Partnerships Act for certain insular areas, extend time for a certain jurisdiction to submit a CDBG statement, and to clarify the authority of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development regarding low-income housing covenants.
- Amendment SP 1435 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1435 Proposed by Senator Mitchell for Senator Breaux to Amendment SP 1434. To permit the citizens of St. Charles Parish, Louisiana, to appeal a flood elevation determination.
- S.AMDT.1435 Amendment SP 1435 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 1434 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1434 Amendment SP 1434 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- The substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 22, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.
On October 21, 1991 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Gonzalez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 17, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.1434
To amend the Cranston-Gonzalez National Affordable Housing Act to reserve assistance under the HOME Investment Partnerships Act for certain insular areas, extend time for a certain jurisdiction to submit a CDBG statement, and to clarify the authority of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development regarding low-income housing covenants.
S.AMDT.1435
To permit the citizens of St. Charles Parish, Louisiana, to appeal a flood elevation determination.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor