+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On December 3, 2009 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 394 - 11 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On December 2, 2009 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3570 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Conyers moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On October 28, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 111-319 .
On September 16, 2009 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 0.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 15, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor