+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 20, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-685 , Part I.
- Committee on Transportation discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 496.
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On December 8, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
On December 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On December 6, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor