+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 25, 2014 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 113-133.
- Signed by President.
On July 15, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4355-4364)
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2631-2632)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 356.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2631)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 35.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-57.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House