+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-175.
- Signed by President.
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Cleared for White House.
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3557 .
- Mr. Bachus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 413 - 1 .
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy.
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking and Financial Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor