+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-184.
On September 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On September 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On July 23, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Bucshon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3556 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 27, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-456 .
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 128.
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On December 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On December 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor