+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On August 30, 1983 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-91.
- Signed by President.
On August 22, 1983 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 17, 1983 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On August 4, 1983 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 4, 1983 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 4, 1983 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on The Judiciary Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 18, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law.
On July 13, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor