+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On August 2, 1974 in the House:
- Private Law 93-87.
- Signed by President.
On July 22, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On July 18, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On July 18, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On July 16, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 93-1012.
On October 18, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On October 16, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
On August 2, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 93-437.
On January 31, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor