+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On December 23, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 117-79.
On December 17, 2021 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S9242)
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S9242)
On December 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On December 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-207.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 148.
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7509-7514)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3537.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7535-7536)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 3 (Roll no. 415).(text: CR H7509-7511)
On December 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 3 (Roll no. 415). (text: CR H7509-7511)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
On November 4, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsors (332)
Type:
Primary Sponsor