+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On June 6, 2000 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-650 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Sherwood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 360.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3535 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 390 - 1 .
On May 24, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 18, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 13, 2000 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor