+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On October 31, 1983 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On September 1, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On August 25, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and National Parks.
On July 14, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On July 11, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor