+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On October 13, 1992 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 102-408.
- Signed by President.
On October 3, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 30, 1992 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate.
On September 29, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motions to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the conference report Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
On September 29, 1992 in the Senate:
- Mr. Wyden moved to suspend the rules and agree to the conference report, H. Rept. 102-925.
- Conference report H. Rept. 102-925 filed.
On September 28, 1992 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 25, 1992 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report by Voice Vote.
- Conference papers: Senate report and managers' statement and official papers held at the desk in Senate.
On September 24, 1992 in the Senate:
- Conferees agreed to file conference report.
On March 18, 1992 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- By unanimous consent, the Speaker reserved the right to make additional appointments.
- The Chair appointed conferees: Dingell, Waxman, Richardson, Lent, and Bliley.
- On motion that the House disagree to the Senate amendment, and agree to a conference Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Waxman asked unanimous consent that the House disagree to the Senate amendment, and agree to a conference.
On November 26, 1991 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.1447 Proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Kennedy. To provide for the Health Professions Training and Nurse Education Improvement and Reauthorization Act of 1991.
- Amendment SP 1447 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Kennedy.
- Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Kennedy; Metzenbaum; Simon; Hatch; Kassebaum.
- Amendment SP 1447 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1447 Amendment SP 1447 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 20, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 337.
On November 15, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 12, 1991 in the House:
- Mr. Waxman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 25, 1991 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165.
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 102-275.
On October 24, 1991 in the House:
- Mr. Waxman asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Energy and Commerce have until 6:00 p.m. on Oct. 25 to file a report on H.R. 3508 . Agreed to without objection.
On October 8, 1991 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 3, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1447
To provide for the Health Professions Training and Nurse Education Improvement and Reauthorization Act of 1991.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor