+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On August 4, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 381.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-674 .
On July 22, 1998 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 4, 1998 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 7, 1998 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor