+ − Summary
+ − Actions (22)
On July 25, 1994 in the House:
- See H.R.4822 .
- For Further Action See H.R.4822 .
On July 14, 1994 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On June 30, 1994 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On June 14, 1994 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On July 6, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
On March 2, 1993 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On February 19, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Information, Justice, Transportation and Agriculture.
On January 28, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education and Civil Rights.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education and Training.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor Standards, Occupational Health and Safety.
On January 19, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Personnel and Police.
On January 15, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
On January 5, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor