+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 11, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 409.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-725 , Part II.
- Reported by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 106-725 , Part I.
On May 24, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 19, 2000 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime Discharged.
On May 17, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 10, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 6, 2000 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On December 14, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection.
On December 6, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
On November 19, 1999 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On November 18, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor