+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 15, 1983 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On November 15, 1983 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- For Further Action See S.1102 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On November 10, 1983 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 298.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 98-525.
- Executive Comment Received From OMB.
On November 9, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From CBO.
On November 1, 1983 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 6, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On September 29, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 2, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 27, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 19, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 12, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Merchant Marine.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT, Justice.
On June 30, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor