+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 12, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 112-666 , Part I.
- Committee on Transportation discharged.
- Committee on Natural Resources discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 480.
On December 13, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On December 1, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 12.
On November 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
On November 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On November 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Natural Resources
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor