+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor