+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 117-56.
On November 3, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7450)
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7450)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On September 20, 2021 in the House:
- Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4541-4543)
On September 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 20, 2021 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3475.
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4541)
On September 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4541)
On August 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor