+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On October 25, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Procurement, Tourism, and Rural Development.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on SBA, the General Economy, and Minority Enterprise Development.
On October 24, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employment Opportunities.
On October 15, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Stabilization.
On October 7, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, and Rural Development.
On October 2, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor