+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On October 25, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-527.
- Signed by President.
On October 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 19, 1988 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 18, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 18, 1988 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report by Voice Vote.
On October 6, 1988 in the House:
- House Agreed to Conference Report by Voice Vote.
- Conference papers: message on House action held at the desk in Senate.
On October 3, 1988 in the Senate:
- Conference papers: Senate report and managers' statement held at the desk in Senate.
On October 3, 1988 in the House:
- Conference Report 100-1036 Filed in House.
On October 3, 1988 in the Senate:
- Conferees agreed to file conference report.
On September 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed conferees Cranston; Murkowski from the committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Senate agreed to request for conference. Appointed conferees. Glenn; Sasser; Levin; Mitchell; Roth; Stevens; Heinz.
- Senate insists on its amendments by Voice Vote.
On August 11, 1988 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House requests a conference.
On August 10, 1988 in the Senate:
- House Disagreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On August 10, 1988 in the House:
- House Requested a Conference and Speaker Appointed Conferees: Brooks, Conyers, Weiss, Frank, Montgomery, Edwards , Horton, Walker, Lightfoot, Solomon.
On July 26, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 12, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 533 with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Yea-Nay Vote. 84-11. Record Vote No: 242.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 533 amended.
- Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On November 19, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On November 17, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 399 - 17 .
On November 16, 1987 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Government Operations. Report No: 100-435.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 279.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Considered by House Unfinished Business.
On November 10, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 5, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 27, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 22, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
On October 13, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor